skip to content

Davidson, Alan Stuart

CPSO#: 16710

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 22 Nov 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Nov 2000
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1958
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Suspension of registration imposed: Fitness to Practise Committee Effective: 26 Nov 1996
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Nov 2000

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 02 Apr 1996
Summary:

 On April 2, 1995, a panel of the Fitness to Practise Committee found Dr. Alan Stuart Davidson to be 
 an incapacitated member of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario as defined in 
 subsection 1 (1) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health 
 Professions Act, 1991.  Pursuant to that finding, on November 26, 1996, a panel of the Fitness to 
 Practise Committee made an order to suspend Dr. Davidson(s certificate of registration for a 
 minimum of one year and indefinitely thereafter or until Dr. Davidson meets the conditions which 
 the Fitness to Practise Committee ordered to be imposed on his certificate of registration.   The 
 suspension of Dr. Davidson(s certificate of registration began on November 26, 1996. 

Dr. 
 Davidson has appealed from the decision of the Fitness to Practise Committee to the Divisional 
 Court.  The order of the Fitness to Practise Committee to suspend and impose conditions on Dr. 
 Davidson(s certificate of registration takes effect notwithstanding the appeal.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 20 Nov 1995