skip to content

Wardle, David Lee James

CPSO#: 57264

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prestige Cosmetic Surgery
Suite 112
6 Cataraqui Street
Kingston ON  K7K 1Z7
Phone: 613-417-1969
Fax: 613-767-6638 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Wardle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2022

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:24 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID LEE JAMES WARDLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WARDLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2021
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2021
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 13 May 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2022

Previous Hearings

Committee: Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal
Decision Date: 13 Dec 2021
Summary:

Allegations of Dr. Wardle’s professional misconduct have been referred to what is now called the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal. It is alleged that Dr. Wardle engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct and/or sexual abuse of patients.

Decision Summary: In February and June 2021, allegations of professional misconduct against Dr. Wardle were referred to the Discipline Committee of the College, now the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal.
The OPSDT heard the matter on December 13, 2021 by videoconference. Counsel for the College and counsel for Dr. Wardle attended the hearing, as did Dr. Wardle.

On the basis of an Agreed Statement of Facts and Admission (Liability) and after hearing submissions of both parties, the OPSDT found Dr. Wardle committed an act of professional misconduct in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

Disposition

Upon reviewing the Agreed Statement of Facts on Penalty and taking into account the parties’ joint submission on penalty, the OPSDT issued its Order on December 13, 2021 directing that:

• Dr. Wardle attend before the panel to be reprimanded;
• the Registrar suspend Dr. Wardle’s certificate of registration for five months commencing immediately;
• the Registrar place the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wardle’s certificate of registration effective immediately:
o Dr. Wardle shall comply with the College Policy “Closing a Medical Practice”;
o Dr. Wardle will participate in the PROBE Ethics & Boundaries Program offered by the Centre for Personalized Education for Professionals, by receiving a passing evaluation or grade, without condition or qualification. Dr. Wardle will complete the PROBE program within six (6) months of the date of this Order, and will provide proof to the College of his completion, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it; and
o Dr. Wardle will attend and successfully complete the SAEGIS Successful Patient Interactions course. Dr. Wardle shall complete this requirement within six (6) months of the date of this Order and shall provide his certificate of attendance to the College within one (1) month of completion, including the number of credits received. If the program is unavailable within that time, Dr. Wardle may fulfill this requirement by completing another program related to this topic acceptable to the College within the same time period and forthwith providing proof of completion to the College; and
• Dr. Wardle pay costs to the College in the amount of $6000.00

Reasons for decision

On February 3, 2022, the Tribunal released its reasons for decision, which are available on the websites of the Tribunal and the College.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): 2021-12-13