skip to content

Datta, Nilanjana

CPSO#: 98614

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jan 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: (416) 291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nilanjana Datta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Datta ( CPSO# 98614 )

Business Address:
Malvern Medical Centre
Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone Number: (416) 291-7719

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NILANJANA DATTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DATTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2016