Dashti, Behnoosh (CPSO#: 98430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
360 Dundas Street East, Unit B5
Oakville ON  L6H 6Z9
Phone: 905-2578777
Fax: 905-2570437
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dashti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Dashti ( CPSO# 98430 )

Business Address:
Iroquois Ridge Medical Centre
B5 - 360 Dundas Street East
Oakville ON  L6H 6Z9
Phone Number: (905) 257-8777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BEHNOOSH DASHTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DASHTI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2014 to 10 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 10 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 10 Mar 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 11 Mar 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2016