skip to content

Das, Sumit Kumar

CPSO#: 91927

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2014
EXPIRY DATE
31 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Ross University School of Medicine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective:21 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014