skip to content

Das, Pavani Reddy

CPSO#: 94444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Nov 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 24 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northwestern University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Gw 33
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6130
Fax: (416) 756-6449 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Oct 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective:24 Sep 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Mar 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2020 Active
 Dr. Pavani Reddy Das may practise medicine independently in infectious diseases and internal medicine.