skip to content

Daryawish, Marilyn

CPSO#: 25415

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 1973
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 1973

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, Assyrian, English, Persian

Education:University of Baghdad, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2-1160
beaverwood rd.
manotick on.
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone: (613) 692-0244
Fax: (613) 692-0258 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sargon B. Gandilo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 15 2018
Corporation Name: Marilyn Daryawish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Daryawish ( CPSO# 25415 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
1160 Beaverwood Road
Manotick ON  K4M 1L6
Phone Number: (613) 692-0244

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 11 Jul 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARILYN DARYAWISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARYAWISH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1973