skip to content

Darwish Hassan, Ahmed Abd El Magid

CPSO#: 94522

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 14 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Cairo, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 21 Jan 2011
PEAP - CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 31 Oct 2012
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Aug 2013
CF - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2013