skip to content

Darwish, Hanni Adel

CPSO#: 93559

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 Old Penetanguishene Road
Suite 200
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-5825
Fax: (705) 526-0239 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: (705) 526-4491
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Darwish Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Cuttini ( CPSO# 93773 )
Dr. H. Darwish ( CPSO# 93559 )

Business Address:
Huronia Medical Centre
Suite 200
P O Box 790
240 Old Penetang Road
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-5825

Business Address:
1112 Saint Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANNI ADEL DARWISH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARWISH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2012