skip to content

Dargavel, Callum Andrew

CPSO#: 93792

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone: (905) 820-7877
Fax: (905) 820-4887 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite #183
2225 Erin Mills Pkwy
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Canada
Phone: (905) 823-0223
Fax: (905) 823-9780
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Callum Dargavel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dargavel ( CPSO# 93792 )

Business Address:
Suite 509
2300 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2V8
Phone Number: (905) 820-7877

Business Address:
Sheridan Centre
183 - 2225 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5K 1T9
Phone Number: (905) 823-0223

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CALLUM ANDREW DARGAVEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARGAVEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014