skip to content

Daraei, Nemat Allah

CPSO#: 97189

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
40 Colborne St W
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y4
Phone: (705) 327-6576
Fax: (705) 327-6579 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nemat Daraei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Daraei ( CPSO# 97189 )

Business Address:
40 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Y4
Phone Number: (705) 327-6576

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:14 Sep 2020 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NEMAT ALLAH DARAEI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DARAEI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: February 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

As of August 10, 2016, all aspects of the SCERP have been fulfilled.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)