skip to content

Dar, Seema

CPSO#: 97505

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Nov 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Ross University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
206-1711 McCowan Rd
Scarborough ON  M1S 2Y3
Phone: (416) 293-0275
Fax: (416) 293-8057 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

30-747 Don Mills Rd
North York ON  M3C 1T2
Canada
Phone: 416-421-8372
Fax: 416-421-8379
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Seema Dar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dar ( CPSO# 97505 )

Business Address:
206 - 1711 McCowan Road
Scarborough ON  M1S 2Y3
Phone Number: (416) 293-0275

Business Address:
30 - 747 Don Mills Road
North York ON  M3C 1T2
Phone Number: (416) 421-8372


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Nov 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 28 May 2012 to 23 Jun 2012
EL - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2015 Active
             Dr. Seema Dar may practise medicine independently in family medicine.