skip to content

Daoud, Hani Ibrahim Khaled

CPSO#: 91829

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah College o, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 10 Aug 2009
PEAP - CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013