skip to content

Wiseman, Daniele Patrice

CPSO#: 78490

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2004
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Victoria Hospital
L H S C
Westminister Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 55871 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Daniele Wiseman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wiseman ( CPSO# 78490 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4G5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre South Street Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:23 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DANIELE PATRICE WISEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WISEMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Sep 2002
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2004