skip to content

Daniel, Shanon Mary

CPSO#: 96782

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Malayalam

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Dorval Drive, Suite 701
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone: 905-338-3937
Fax: 905-338-3930 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

2130 Lawrence Ave E #403
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Canada
Phone: (647) 346-5222
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Daniel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 24 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Daniel ( CPSO# 96782 )

Business Address:
701 - 710 Dorval Drive
Oakville ON  L6K 3V7
Phone Number: (905) 338-3937

Business Address:
2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Suite 403
Scarborough ON  M1R 3A6
Phone Number: (647) 346-5222


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHANON MARY DANIEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANIEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 26 Sep 2011 to 07 Oct 2011
EL - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2012