skip to content

Dang, Radhika Natasha

CPSO#: 88957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Sep 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute - Mississauga
Unit 1, Millway Plaza
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone: (905) 820-3937 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Prism Eye Institute - Brampton
Unit 605
7700 Hurontario
Brampton, Ontario
Toronto ON  L6Y 4M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 456 3937
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: R.N. Dang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Dang ( CPSO# 88957 )

Business Address:
207 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
Go Eyecare
Unit 1
3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 820-3937

Business Address:
Unit 605
7700 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RADHIKA NATASHA DANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2015