skip to content

Danforth, Leonard Roy Tag

CPSO#: 89367

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clergy Street Family Physicians
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone: (613) 542-7858 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

445 Cebre St N
Napanee ON  K7R 3S4
Canada
Phone: 613-354-6072
County: County of Lennox and Addington
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Danforth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Danforth ( CPSO# 89367 )

Business Address:
Clergy Street Family Physicians
71 Clergy Street East
Kingston ON  K7L 3J3
Phone Number: (613) 542-7858

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 21 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LEONARD ROY TAG DANFORTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANFORTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010