Danescu, Septimiu Cristian (CPSO#: 97163)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Jan 2012

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone: (519) 744-1785
Fax: (226) 887-8687
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

167 Rolph St.
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Canada
Phone: (519) 842-3611 Ext. 5232
Fax: (519) 842-7008
County: County of Oxford
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danescu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Danescu ( CPSO# 97163 )

Business Address:
Suite 308
430 The Boardwalk
Waterloo ON  N2T 0C1
Phone Number: (519) 744-1785

Business Address:
167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 07 Jan 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
member Effective: 07 Jan 2019 Active View Details [+]
            (1 of 2)
            As  from  January  7,  2019,  the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of  registration  held  by  Dr. Septimiu Cristian
            Danescu, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given  by Dr. Danescu to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. SEPTIMIU CRISTIAN DANESCU
                                          ("Dr. Danescu")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which  is Schedule 2
                  to  the  Regulated  Health  Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c.  18,  as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries,  Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;

                  "Public Register" means the College's register  that  is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Danescu, certificate of registration number 97163,  am a member of
                  the College.  

            (3)   I,  Dr.  Danescu, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File  Number  105407 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct  and/or am incompetent in my internal medicine
                  practice.

            (4)   I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, if an original copy of this Undertaking
                  as signed by me is accepted by  the  Inquiries,  Complaints  and  Reports
                  Committee, the College will also deliver a caution in person. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Danescu, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective upon the date this Undertaking is approved by the ICR Committee
                  ("Effective Date").

            (6)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I,  Dr.  Danescu,  undertake  to  participate  in  and successfully
                        complete  all  aspects  of  the  detailed  IEP, attached hereto  as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a   program   satisfactory   to   the  College   in   medical
                              record-keeping; 
                  
                        (ii)  review     the    College    Policy    "Medical     Records":
                              http://www.cpso.on.ca/Policies-Publications/Policy/Medical-Records;
                              and
                  
                        (iii) review  and prepare  a  written  summary  regarding  patients
                              presenting  with  decreased level of consciousness, including
                              the role of glucose testing and administration of dextrose.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Danescu, undertake  to  provide  proof  to the College of my
                        successful  completion  of  the  Professional Education,  including
                        proof  of registration and attendance  and  participant  assessment
                        reports,  within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College  will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Danescu,  undertake to complete this requirement by March 1,
                        2019 or, if no satisfactory  program  is available by that time, by
                        the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I,  Dr.  Danescu,  acknowledge  that a report  or  reports  may  be
                        provided to the College regarding  my  progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (7)   Change of Scope/Re-Entering Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that I have  not  practiced  in-patient
                        internal medicine since November 2016. 
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Danescu,  undertake  that,  prior to resuming practice  in
                        in-patient  internal medicine, I will report  to  the  College  and
                        comply with the process set out in the College's Policy on Ensuring
                        Competence: Changing  Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice
                        attached hereto as Appendix "B".  
                  
            (8)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Danescu, undertake  to  inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have  privileges,  including,  but  not
                        limited  to,  any  hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with  which  I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively  my  "Practice Location"  or  "Practice  Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake  to  inform  the  College  of  any  and all new
                        Practice  Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice  at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Danescu,  undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced  inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        records by a College  representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Danescu, give my  irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP  and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information,  in  order  for  the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            (d)   I,  Dr.  Danescu, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent  form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "C". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (9)   I, Dr. Danescu,  acknowledge  that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (10)  I,  Dr.  Danescu,  acknowledge and  undertake  that  I  shall  be  solely
                  responsible for payment  of  all  fees,  costs,  charges,  expenses, etc.
                  arising  from  the  implementation  of  any  of  the  provisions of  this
                  Undertaking. 

            (11)  I,  Dr.  Danescu,  acknowledge  that  I  have  read  and  understand  the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel  in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have  waived  my
                  right to do so.

            (12)  I,  Dr.  Danescu,   acknowledge   that  the  College  will  provide  this
                  Undertaking  to  any  Chief  of  Staff,   or  a  colleague  with  similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location  ("Chief  of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (13)  I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that a breach by me of any  provision of this
                  Undertaking  may  constitute  an  act  of professional misconduct  and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral  of  specified  allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (14)  I,  Dr.  Danescu,  acknowledge  that this Undertaking constitutes  terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my  certificate  of  registration  for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (15)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that, during the time period that  this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted  on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I,  Dr.  Danescu, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being  posted   in  accordance  with  section  (15)(a)  above,  the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A  College  investigation  was  conducted  into  whether  Dr.
                              Danescu  engaged   in   professional   misconduct  and/or  is
                              incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

                              Dr.  Danescu has not practiced in-patient  internal  medicine
                              since   November   2016.    Prior  to  resuming  practice  in
                              in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the
                              College and comply with  the process set out in the College's
                              Policy on Ensuring Competence:  Changing  Scope  of  Practice
                              and/or Re-Entering Practice.
                              As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage  in
                              professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical
                              care issues.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Danescu, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (16)  I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any  information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
            (c)   any information  arising  from  the monitoring of my compliance with this
                  Undertaking.

            (17)  I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information  the  College  has  that  led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (18)  I, Dr. Danescu, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my  completion  of  the  Professional  Education and Chiefs of Staff,  to
                  disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any  information  relevant  for  the  purposes   of  monitoring  my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any  information which comes to their attention in  the  course  of
                        providing  the  Professional  Education  and  which they reasonably
                        believes indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.
                  
            (2 of 2) 

            As from January 30, 2014, by order of the Registration Committee of the College
            of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Ontario, the following term,  condition  and
            limitation is imposed on the certificate  of  registration held by Dr. Septimiu
            Cristian Danescu:

                  Dr.  Septimiu  Cristian Danescu may practise  medicine  independently  in
                  internal medicine, only.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: January 7, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Septimiu Cristian Danescu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective January 7, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Danescu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his internal medicine practice.

Dr. Danescu has not practiced in-patient internal medicine since November 2016. Prior to resuming practice in in-patient internal medicine, Dr. Danescu shall report to the College and comply with the process set out in the College’s Policy on Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-Entering Practice.

As a result of the investigation, Dr. Danescu will engage in professional education in medical record-keeping and clinical care issues.