skip to content

Danescu, Liviu George

CPSO#: 97616

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 31 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 108
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3
Phone: (519) 763-2969
Fax: (519) 763-7615 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Danescu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Danescu ( CPSO# 97616 )

Business Address:
Suite 108
21 Surrey Street West
Guelph ON  N1H 3R3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:31 May 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Nov 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2013 Active
 Dr.  Liviu  George  Danescu  may  practise  medicine  independently in internal
            medicine and endocrinology, only.