skip to content

Daneman, Denis

CPSO#: 28953

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Aug 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-6122
Fax: (416) 813-7479 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:23 May 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:04 Sep 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DENIS DANEMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANEMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Nov 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1981