Dancel, Mary Lou Mamuri (CPSO#: 42475)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Feb 2019

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Feb 2019

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1600 Firwood Cres Peterborough ON K9K 1S8
Date Received: 05 Feb 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 08 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 25 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Nov 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Feb 2019

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: September 28, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Mary Lou Mamuri Dancel to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 28, 2015:

Dr. Dancel was the subject of College investigations into allegations that she fell below the standard of care in her record-keeping, treatment and care in her psychiatric practice. As a result of the investigations:

- Dr. Dancel will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

- Dr. Dancel will engage in professional education pertaining to her care and treatment of patients, including in her prescribing and record-keeping.

- Dr. Dancel's practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the completion of all aspects of the education program.