skip to content

Danby, Michelle Christine

CPSO#: 92892

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A3H7
Phone: (519) 963-1875
Fax: 519-963-1880 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michelle Danby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Danby ( CPSO# 92892 )

Business Address:
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Stratford General Hospital Stratford
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELLE CHRISTINE DANBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DANBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014