skip to content

Damaraju, Deepti

CPSO#: 90776

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
89 Queensway West
Suite 214
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: 905 848 6079
Fax: 905 858 8835 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

150 Sherway Drive
Medical Clinics, 2nd Floor
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: 416 521 4196
Fax: 416 521 4082
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Deepti Damaraju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Damaraju ( CPSO# 90776 )

Business Address:
Mississauga Lung Health Centre
Suite 214
89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-6079

Business Address:
Medical Clinics
2nd Floor
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DEEPTI DAMARAJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMARAJU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2015