skip to content

Dalziel, Peter Scott

CPSO#: 30061

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter S. Dalziel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 8 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Sola Ogunsina 307-190 Cundles Rd E Barrie, ON L4M 4S5
Date Received: 04 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Sep 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2019