skip to content

Daly, Lanval Joseph

CPSO#: 27674

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 08 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 336
Sunnyside West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6152
Fax: (416) 530-6830 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lanval J. Daly Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Daly ( CPSO# 27674 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Suite 336
Sunnyside West
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6152


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Montserrat

Hospital Privileges Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

No Privileges reported.


Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  December 15, 2017
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 15, 2017, St. Joseph’s Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly’s elective surgical privileges at St. Joseph’s Health Centre have been suspended, effective December 15, 2017.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 08 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 08 Aug 2019 Active
             As from August 8, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Daly to the College
            of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                                    DR. LANVAL JOSEPH DALY  
                                          ("Dr. Daly")
                  
                                                to
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                                                                                     
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Discipline Committee" means the Discipline Committee of the College;
                  
                  "LEEP" means loop electrosurgical excision procedure;
                  
                  "Medicine Act" means the Medicine Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 30, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "OHP" means an out of hospital premises subject to inspection by the
                  College pursuant to Part XI of Regulation 114/94 of the Medicine Act;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public; and
                  
                  "Restricted Procedure" means any one of the following procedures:
                  
                        (i)   Hysteroscopy;
                        (ii)  Hysteroscopic myomectomy;
                        (iii) Hysteroscopic polypectomy;
                        (iv)  Cold knife cone biopsy;
                        (v)   Surgical reconstruction in female genital mutilation;
                        (vii) Episiotomy revision;
                        (viii)Perineorrhapy.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Daly, certificate of registration number 27674, am a member of the
                  College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation
                  bearing File Number 1100285 (the "Investigation") into whether, in my
                  obstetrical and gynecological practice and conduct, I engaged in
                  professional misconduct and/or am incompetent.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (5)   Practice Restrictions

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake, subject to paragraphs (5)(b) and (7) of
                        this Undertaking, to restrict my practice to an office-based
                        obstetrical/gynecological practice (providing obstetrical care up
                        to but not beyond 28 weeks of gestation) limited to only the most
                        minor, low-level office-based procedures, such as simple biopsies;
                        provided, however, that any and all LEEPs performed by me must be
                        performed in a hospital or OHP.
                  
                  (b)   Notwithstanding paragraph (5)(a) above, I, Dr. Daly, understand
                        that I may perform a Restricted Procedure(s) but only if each and
                        every one of the following requirements are met with respect to
                        each Restricted Procedure that I perform:
                  
                        (i)   I perform the Restricted Procedure under the direct
                              supervision of a clinical supervisor or clinical supervisors
                              acceptable to the College (the "Clinical Supervisor" or
                              "Clinical Supervisors") on the terms set out in paragraph (7)
                              below; and
                  
                        (ii)  I perform the Restricted Procedure in a hospital or an OHP.
                  
            (6)   I, Dr. Daly, further acknowledge and agree that I am bound by the
                  College's Policy on Change of Scope of Practice, a copy of which is
                  attached as Appendix "A" to this Undertaking.  

            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake that for each and every Restricted Procedure
                        I perform (if any), I shall perform the Restricted Procedure under
                        the direct supervision of a Clinical Supervisor.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake and acknowledge that the requirement that I
                        perform all Restricted Procedures under the direct supervision of a
                        Clinical Supervisor shall cease only upon written approval from the
                        College in the College's sole discretion.  In any event, I
                        acknowledge that the direct Clinical Supervision of all my
                        Restricted Procedures shall apply for a minimum period of six (6)
                        months. After a minimum of six (6) months of Clinical Supervision,
                        and upon the recommendation of the Clinical Supervisor, I may apply
                        to the College for approval to perform any or all of the Restricted
                        Procedures independently.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "B", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor. The
                        Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "C";
                  
                        (ii)  Review the materials provided by the College and have an
                              initial meeting with me to discuss practice improvement
                              recommendations;
                  
                        (iii) Directly supervise and observe each and every Restricted
                              Procedure that I perform; 
                  
                        (iv)  After each Restricted Procedure that I perform, review the
                              patient chart and discuss with me any concerns arising from
                              the Clinical Supervisor's direct observation of the
                              Restricted Procedure and the chart review; 
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor deems necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; 
                  
                        (vii) Maintain a log of all Restricted Procedures that the Clinical
                              Supervisor has observed me performing; and
                  
                        (viii)Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the terms of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "B" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor, including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to ensure that Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College at least
                        fourteen (14) days prior to me performing any Restricted Procedure.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "B" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall not
                        perform any further Restricted Procedure(s) unless and until I
                        obtain an executed undertaking in the same form from a similarly
                        qualified person who is acceptable to the College and ensure that
                        it is delivered to the College and approved by the College.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that if I am required to cease practise as
                        a result of section (7)(f) above, this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Posting a Sign

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake that I shall post a sign in all waiting
                        rooms of all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure
                        location, in the form set out at Appendix "D".  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                              Dr. Daly's practice is restricted as follows:
                  
                                    1.    Dr. Daly's practice is restricted to an
                                          office-based obstetrical/gynecological practice
                                          (providing obstetrical care up to but not beyond
                                          28 weeks of gestation) limited to only the most
                                          minor, low-level office-based procedures, such as
                                          simple biopsies.
                  
                                    2.    Any loop electrosurgical excision procedure
                                          performed by Dr. Daly must be performed in a
                                          hospital or Out-of-Hospital Premises.
                  
                                    3.    Notwithstanding the above, Dr. Daly may perform
                                          any of the following procedures provided that he
                                          performs the procedure under the direct
                                          supervision of a Clinical Supervisor in a
                                          hospital or Out-of-Hospital Premises:
                  
                                          (i)   Hysteroscopy;
                                          (ii)  Hysteroscopic myomectomy;
                                          (iii) Hysteroscopic polypectomy;
                                          (iv)  Cold knife cone biopsy;
                                          (v)   Surgical reconstruction in female genital
                                                mutilation;
                                          (vii) Episiotomy revision;
                                          (viii)Perineorrhapy.
                  
                                    Further information may be found on the College of
                                    Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at
                                    www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (8)(a) in all waiting rooms of all my Practice Locations,
                        in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form set out at
                        Appendix "D".
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to provide the certified translation
                        described in section (8)(b), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language, I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation described in section (8)(b) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in any language described in section (8)(d).
                  
            (9)   Monitoring

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location where I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent
                        Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction
                        (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"),
                        within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward,
                        I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new
                        Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at
                        that location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daly, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient
                        charts by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring
                        my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
            (d)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form,
                  attached hereto as Appendix "E". 

            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (10)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (11)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (12)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (13)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

            (14)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee.

            (15)  I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (16)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Daly, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daly,
                              in his obstetrical and gynecological practice and conduct,
                              engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent.  As
                              a result of the investigation, Dr. Daly's practice is
                              restricted as follows:
                  
                              1.    Dr. Daly's practice is restricted to an office-based
                                    obstetrical/gynecological practice (providing
                                    obstetrical care up to but not beyond 28 weeks of
                                    gestation) limited to only the most minor, low-level
                                    office-based procedures, such as simple biopsies.
                  
                              2.    Any loop electrosurgical excision procedure performed
                                    by Dr. Daly must be performed in a hospital or
                                    Out-of-Hospital Premises.  
                  
                              3.    Notwithstanding the above, Dr. Daly may perform any of
                                    the following procedures provided that he performs the
                                    procedure under the direct supervision of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor in a hospital or Out-of-Hospital Premises:
                  
                                    (i)   Hysteroscopy;
                                    (ii)  Hysteroscopic myomectomy;
                                    (iii) Hysteroscopic polypectomy;
                                    (iv)  Cold knife cone biopsy;
                                    (v)   Surgical reconstruction in female genital
                                          mutilation;
                                    (vii) Episiotomy revision;
                                    (viii)Perineorrhapy.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (17)  I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (18)  I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (19)  I, Dr. Daly, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant to the provisions of the Clinical
                        Supervisor's undertaking set out at Appendix "B" to this
                        Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   any information relevant to any reassessment of my practice;
                  
                  (d)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or
                  
                  (e)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 8, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Lanval Joseph Daly to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 8, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Daly, in his obstetrical and gynecological practice and conduct, engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Daly’s practice is restricted as follows:

1. Dr. Daly’s practice is restricted to an office-based obstetrical/gynecological practice (providing obstetrical care up to but not beyond 28 weeks of gestation) limited to only the most minor, low-level office-based procedures, such as simple biopsies.

2. Any loop electrosurgical excision procedure performed by Dr. Daly must be performed in a hospital or Out-of-Hospital Premises.

3. Notwithstanding the above, Dr. Daly may perform any of the following procedures provided that he performs the procedure under the direct supervision of a Clinical Supervisor in a hospital or Out-of-Hospital Premises:

(i) Hysteroscopy;
(ii) Hysteroscopic myomectomy;
(iii) Hysteroscopic polypectomy;
(iv) Cold knife cone biopsy;
(v) Surgical reconstruction in female genital mutilation;
(vii) Episiotomy revision;
(viii) Perineorrhapy.

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On March 15, 2012, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Toronto, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Daly.