skip to content

Dalvi, Anil Ashok

CPSO#: 92799

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
204-40 Hillside Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W3
Phone: 905-702-2629
Fax: 905-702-5225 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 11 & 12
390 Steeles Ave W.
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: (905) 882-6566
Fax: (905) 882-6567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANIL ASHOK DALVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015