skip to content

Dalgorf, Dustin Mark

CPSO#: 86722

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2390 Bloor St. West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone: (416) 762-8287
Fax: (416) 762-0709 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave, Room 401
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-8533
Fax: (416) 586-8600
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

491 Eglinton Ave West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 787-5511
Fax: (416) 787-1592
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dustin Dalgorf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Dalgorf ( CPSO# 86722 )

Business Address:
2390 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M6S 1P5
Phone Number: (416) 762-8287

Business Address:
101 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5

Business Address:
St. Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DUSTIN MARK DALGORF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DALGORF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013