skip to content

Dalgleish, Philp Irvine Douglas

CPSO#: 15767

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Dec 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Access Services Canada, Inc. (RASCI) 854 Upper Canada Drive Sarnia, ON N7W 1A4 Tel: 800 971 8038 ext. 102 Website: www.rasci.ca
Date Received: 06 Apr 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1956
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Dec 2013

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 2, 2013
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective December 2, 2013, Dr. Dalgleish has resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.