skip to content

Dalal, Meera Michele

CPSO#: 100538

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2013 to 28 Jun 2013
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 20 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Feb 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2018 to 30 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 31 Mar 2018 to 27 Apr 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 28 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Nov 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 29 Nov 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2018