skip to content

Dakin, Edward Bolton

CPSO#: 28763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 May 2006
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone: (905) 889-1125
Fax: 905 889-4216 Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 10 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 May 2007

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 17 May 2007 Active
             As from May 10, 2006, and amended on May 17, 2007, Dr. Edward Dakin undertakes
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario the following:

                  1.    I undertake and agree that I will restrict my practice from
                        performing all medical practice except as a surgical assistant
                        meaning that:
                  
                  a)    I, Dr. Edward Dakin, may only assist other physicians at the
                        Shouldice Hospital or other surgeons at any other hospital,
                        acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, in
                        their cases, at which they are present at all times;
                  b)    I cannot be the primary surgeon in any case;
                  c)    I am precluded from providing surgical care including any pre and
                        post-operative care; and
                  d)    at no time will I conduct any independent patient care.