skip to content

Dakhil, Christina Marie

CPSO#: 84647

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
iHealth Centre
Units 19/20
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: (416) 840-8434 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dixie Urgent Care Centre
1500 Dundas St E
Mississauga ON  L4X 1L4
Canada
Phone: 905-212-1433
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christina Dakhil Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Dakhil ( CPSO# 84647 )

Business Address:
Units 21 & 22
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3091

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTINA MARIE DAKHIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAKHIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2008