skip to content

Daigneault, Emilie

CPSO#: 91250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON  K1J 6N3
Phone: 613-366-2605
Fax: 343-888-2605 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Emilie Daigneault Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Daigneault ( CPSO# 91250 )

Business Address:
1740 Montréal Rd
Gloucester ON  K1J 6N3

Business Address:
Clinique Medicale Asclepios
2 - 750 Taylor Creek Drive
Orleans ON  K1C 1T1
Phone Number: (613) 830-8388

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Hawkesbury ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMILIE DAIGNEAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAIGNEAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011