skip to content

Dai, Shujuan

CPSO#: 96943

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 21 Jan 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kunming Medical College, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Oct 2011 to 20 Jan 2012
PEAP - CF - Neurology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 21 Jan 2012 to 31 Mar 2012
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012