skip to content

Dahrouj, Dalal Mohamad

CPSO#: 97826

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 09 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2016 to 17 Oct 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 18 Oct 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Mar 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 13 Mar 2018 to 07 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 08 May 2018 to 04 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Western University, 05 Jun 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Aug 2019