skip to content

Dahlke, Erin Jade

CPSO#: 88329

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
3E Med Ed Teaching Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000 Ext. 6607
Fax: 416-530-6386 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
471 8EW
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416-603-5800 Ext. 5153
Fax: 416 603 2782
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mohs Micrographic Surgery
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
116 Brock Street, C3-027
Kingston, ON, K7L 5G2
Kingston ON  K7L5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3415
Fax: (613)545-2202
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M6S 1B1
Canada
Phone: 416-323-7546
Fax: 416-323-6236
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

187 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5A 2K7
Canada
Phone: 289-301-3011
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Erin Dahlke Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Dahlke ( CPSO# 88329 )

Business Address:
Carlton Skin Clinic
187 Carlton St
Toronto ON  M5A 2K7
Phone Number: 2893013011

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
3E Med Ed Teaching Clinic
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
471 8EW
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital Site
Suite C3-027
116 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2

Business Address:
Adelaide Health Clinic
1 First Canadian Place
P.O. Box 228
Toronto ON  M5X 1C8

Business Address:
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B1
Phone Number: (416) 323-7546

Business Address:
Albany Medical Clinic
807 Broadview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 2P8
Phone Number: (416) 461-9471

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:18 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIN JADE DAHLKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013