skip to content

Dahle, Colin Thomas

CPSO#: 85684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin St E
Cobourg ON  K9A 0A1
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

66 Dorset St E
Regency Long Term Care
Port Hope ON  L1A 1E3
Canada
Phone: 905-885-4558
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2021