skip to content

Dahle, Colin Thomas

CPSO#: 85684

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Dec 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Apr 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Health Centre
Unit 6B
9 Elgin St E
Cobourg ON  K9A 0A1
Phone: (905) 373-1280
Fax: (905) 373-9335 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

66 Dorset St E
Regency Long Term Care
Port Hope ON  L1A 1E3
Canada
Phone: 905-885-4558
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Nov 2006 to 23 Jan 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 24 Jan 2007 to 31 Oct 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Nov 2007 to 20 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 30 Apr 2021 Active
 As from April 28, 2021, the following are imposed as terms, conditions and limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Colin Thomas Dahle  in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Dahle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")
of
DR. COLIN THOMAS DAHLE
("Dr. Dahle")
to 
COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")


A.	PREAMBLE
(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended; 
 "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.
(2)	I, Dr. Dahle, certificate of registration number 85684, am a member of the College.  
(3)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that the College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 1112928 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my family practice.
B.	UNDERTAKING
(4)	I, Dr. Dahle, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.
(5)	Professional Education  
(a)	I, Dr. Dahle, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):
(i)	A minimum of 4 sessions, up to a maximum of 8 sessions, with a capacity assessor or a geriatrician approved by the College, focused on appropriate assessment and documentation in capacity requests, followed by a written summary providing a reflection of the individualized education sessions and subsequent improvements in practice;
(ii)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following resources:            
1.	Capacity Assessment, O Reg 460/05  www.canlii.org/en/on/laws/regu/o-reg-460-05/latest/o-reg-460-05.html;
2.	Guidelines for conducting assessments of     capacity, Capacity Assessment Office, Ontario Ministry of the Attorney General www.attorneygeneral.jus.gov.on.ca/english/family/pgt/capacity/2005-06/guide-0505.pdf;
3.	Assessing the Capacity to Make Decisions, Ontario Ministry of the Attorney General www.attorneygeneral.jus.gov.on.ca/english/family/pgt/incapacity/capacity_assessment.php;
4.	Karlawish J. (2020). Assessment of decision-making capacity in adults. In DeKosky ST & Mendez MF (Ed.), UpToDate. www.uptodate.com/contents/assessment-of-decision-making-capacity-in-adults;
5.	Is this patient capable of consenting? (2016). In the CPMA website article P1102-4-E www.cmpa-acpm.ca/en/advice-publications/browse-articles/2011/is-this-patient-capable-of-consenting
(iii)	any additional professional education recommended by the capacity assessor or geriatrician approved by the College.
(b)	I, Dr. Dahle, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports where relevant, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.
(c)	I, Dr. Dahle, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months of the date upon which I sign this Undertaking.
(d)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.
(e)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that if any of the programs listed above become unavailable, substitution requests will be reviewed by the College and the College will determine in its sole discretion whether substitution is appropriate.
(6)	Monitoring 
(a)	I, Dr. Dahle, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.
C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT
(7)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.
(8)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 
(9)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.
(10)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").
(11)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Committee of the College.
(12)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 
(13)	Public Register
(a)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.
(b)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (16)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Dahle engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:
Dr. Dahle will engage in professional education in capacity assessments.
(c)	I, Dr. Dahle, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
D.	CONSENT
(14)	I, Dr. Dahle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:
(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;
(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 
(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(15)	I, Dr. Dahle, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.
(16)	I, Dr. Dahle, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education to disclose to the College any of the following:
(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;
(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.


Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 28, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Colin Thomas Dahle to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 28, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Dahle engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his practice of family medicine. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Dahle will engage in professional education in capacity assessments.