skip to content

Dahche, Tarek

CPSO#: 87506

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
825 Coxwell Av.
Toronto
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Dahche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Dahche ( CPSO# 87506 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:05 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TAREK DAHCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2009