skip to content

Dahche, Khaled Mahmoud

CPSO#: 92471

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 118
2900 Gibford Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 2R4
Phone: (613) 695-5540
Fax: (866) 883-8852 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Khaled Dahche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Dahche ( CPSO# 92471 )

Business Address:
Unit 118 and 119
2900 Gibford Drive
Ottawa ON  K1V 2R4
Phone Number: (613) 695-5540

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALED MAHMOUD DAHCHE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAHCHE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 08 Feb 2010 to 28 Feb 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2010