skip to content

Dadjo-Guewa, Stephane Batowa

CPSO#: 89939

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Feb 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Feb 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education:Shanghai Medical University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byward Family Health Team
100 Marie-Curie Pvt
Suite 300
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

300-100 Marie Curie Pvt
Ottawa, ON
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Canada
Phone: 613-564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Feb 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANE BATOWA DADJO-GUEWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADJO-GUEWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2009 to 20 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2010 to 25 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2011