skip to content

Dadgostar, Anali

CPSO#: 97080

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 04 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 05 Dec 2011 to 12 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2016