skip to content

Dada, Oluwatomilola Oluwapelumi

CPSO#: 91830

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Makinde, Oluwatomilola Oluwapelumi (used until: 09 Mar 2020 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
FamilyMedicine & Urgent Care Clinic
15 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A6
Phone: 289 298 5474
Fax: 289 298 5472 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Family Medicine Clinic
3100 Dixie Road Unit 9
Mississauga ON  L4Y 2A0
Canada
Phone: 905 273 7333
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Oluwatomilola Dada Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 25 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Dada ( CPSO# 91830 )

Business Address:
Family Medicine & Urgent Care Clinic
15 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A6
Phone Number: (289) 298-5474

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jan 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLUWATOMILOLA OLUWAPELUMI DADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DADA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 09 Jul 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 13 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 14 Dec 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2012