skip to content

Dacosta, Alric Benedict

CPSO#: 29429

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 26 Oct 1993
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1941

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Underserviced Area Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 May 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993