skip to content

Dabee, Vassant

CPSO#: 26359

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Feb 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: CHEO Medical Records 401 Smyth Road Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Date Received: 03 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:07 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:15 Sep 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Feb 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017