skip to content

DaSilva, Sean L

CPSO#: 90895

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Apr 2020
EXPIRY DATE
08 Oct 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 09 Apr 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.L. DaSilva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2013
Corporation Name: S.L. DaSilva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. DaSilva ( CPSO# 90895 )

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:09 Apr 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

Western University, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 08 Oct 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Sean  L  DaSilva  may  practise anesthesiology with Windsor Regional
                  Hospital - Metropolitan Campus  and Windsor Regional Hospital - Ouellette
                  Campus in Windsor, Ontario, while  under  supervision  coordinated  by  a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration  automatically expires eighteen months
                  from the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        DaSilva's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required  reports  to  the  College  by  the due date or if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. DaSilva's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining  to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. DaSilva's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on April 9, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  October 8, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.