skip to content

Da Silva, Agnelo Jose

CPSO#: 21780

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jan 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B.E. Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 24 2015

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who saw Dr. Da Silva outside of a hospital, can request a copy of their records by sending an e-mail to: [email protected]
Date Received: 31 Jan 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015