skip to content

Da Luz, Luis Teodoro

CPSO#: 89164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2023
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fundacao Universitaria do ABC, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Surgery
Room H1 15
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 481-6100 Ext. 88364
Fax: (416) 481-5851 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luis Teodoro Da Luz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Da Luz ( CPSO# 89164 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite H1.15
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:01 Jul 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2023

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active
             1.    Dr. Luis Teodoro Da Luz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        University  of  Toronto,  in  which  Dr.  Da  Luz holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires  seven  years  from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Da Luz  no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Da Luz's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Da Luz's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2016.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended  by  the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2023.