skip to content

D'Sylva, Christopher Teo

CPSO#: 97889

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Diabetes & Endocrinology
Unit 5 - 1600 Steeles Ave West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone: 905-763-8660 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Christopher D'Sylva Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. D'Sylva ( CPSO# 97889 )

Business Address:
5-1600 Steeles Avenue West
Concord ON  L4K 4M2
Phone Number: (905) 763-8660

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER TEO D'SYLVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SYLVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2016