skip to content

D'Souza, Ryan Anthony

CPSO#: 84858

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Aug 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Mumbai, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
380 Armour Road
Peterborough ON  K9H 7L7
Phone: (705) 745-3215
Fax: (705) 745-3216 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ryan D'Souza Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. D'Souza ( CPSO# 84858 )

Business Address:
Suite 2
200 Lorraine Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2B 2R3
Phone Number: (519) 579-8181

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. 1.800.775.0093 or [email protected] 1 High Meadow Place, Unit 13 Toronto, ON M9L 0A3
Instructions: Contact above
Date Received: 21 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RYAN ANTHONY D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2008