skip to content

D'Souza, Pernilla Marissa

CPSO#: 94287

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Apr 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Zeidler Ledcor Centre
130 University Campus Northwest
Edmonton AB  T6G 2X8
Phone: (780) 248-1820

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PERNILLA MARISSA D'SOUZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'SOUZA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Aug 2010 to 27 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2017